military commissions
Found in 8 Collections and/or Records:
William A. Marshall naval commission to Captain, 1906 Aug 4
Official naval commission appointing Marshall a Captain in the U.S. Navy from July 1, 1906, signed by President Theodore Roosevelt and SECNAV Charles J. Bonaparte on August 4, 1906.
William A. Marshall naval commission to Captain, 1907 Jan 2
Official naval commission appointing Marshall a Captain in the U.S. Navy, July 1, 1906, signed by President Theodore Roosevelt and SECNAV Metcalf on January 2, 1907.
William A. Marshall naval commission to Commander, 1899 Apr 20
Official naval commission appointing William A. Marshall a Lieutenant Commander in the U.S. Navy from March 3, 1899, signed by President William McKinley and SECNAV John D. Long on April 20, 1899.
William A. Marshall naval commission to Commander, 1902 Mar 21
Official naval commission appointing William A. Marshall a Commander in the U.S. Navy from December 27, 1901, signed by President Theodore Roosevelt and SECNAV John D. Long on March 21, 1902.
William A. Marshall naval commission to Ensign, 1874 Jun 22
Official naval commission appointing William A. Marshall an Ensign in the U.S. Navy from July 14, 1872, signed by President U.S. Grant on June 22, 1874.
William A. Marshall naval commission to Lieutenant, 1882 May 8
Official naval commission appointing William A. Marshall a Lieutenant in the U.S. Navy from April 15, 1882, signed by President Chester A. Arthur and SECNAV William Chandler on May 8, 1882.
William A. Marshall naval commission to Master, 1875 Dec 15
Official naval commission appointing William A. Marshall a Master in the U.S. Navy from April 22, 1875, signed by President U.S. Grant on December 15, 1875.
William A. Marshall naval commission to Rear Admiral, 1910 Apr 14
Official naval commission appointing Marshall a Rear Admiral in the U.S. Navy from March 17, 1910, signed by President William H. Taft on April 14, 1910.