military commissions
Found in 14 Collections and/or Records:
Alfred T. Mahan commission to Lieutenant, 1862 Feb 19
U.S. Naval Commission to Lieutenant signed by President Abraham Lincoln and Secretary of the Navy Gideon Welles.
Alfred T. Mahan commission to Midshipman, 1856 Oct 2
U.S. Naval Commission to Acting Midshipman signed by Acting Secretary of the Navy Charles Welsh.
Alfred T. Mahan commission to Rear Admiral, 1911 Apr 13
U.S. Naval Commission to Rear Admiral signed by President William H. Taft.
Manuscript Items
This collection consists of single manuscripts items from past NWC presidents, faculty, and staff, as well as other other naval officers and military service members from Rhode Island and the surrounding area. These items include correspondence, journals, reports, certificates, commissions, scrapbooks, and other ephemera that relate to the history of the U.S. Naval War College, the history of navies in the Narragansett Bay region, and the history of naval warfare and strategy.
Stephen McCarthy papers
Lieutenant Stephen McCarthy (1859-1938) served in the U.S. Navy from 1887 until his retirement in 1923. He retired in Newport, Rhode Island. His papers include naval commissions from various promotions in the U.S. Navy.
Joseph H. Wellings papers
This collection consists of materials regarding Wellings’ assignment as U.S. observer of the British Home Fleet, including his reminiscences of the sinking of the Bismarck in May 1941, as well as correspondence, writings, speeches, subject files, and other documentation relating to his naval career.
William A. Marshall naval commission to Captain, 1906 Aug 4
Official naval commission appointing Marshall a Captain in the U.S. Navy from July 1, 1906, signed by President Theodore Roosevelt and SECNAV Charles J. Bonaparte on August 4, 1906.
William A. Marshall naval commission to Captain, 1907 Jan 2
Official naval commission appointing Marshall a Captain in the U.S. Navy, July 1, 1906, signed by President Theodore Roosevelt and SECNAV Metcalf on January 2, 1907.
William A. Marshall naval commission to Commander, 1899 Apr 20
Official naval commission appointing William A. Marshall a Lieutenant Commander in the U.S. Navy from March 3, 1899, signed by President William McKinley and SECNAV John D. Long on April 20, 1899.
William A. Marshall naval commission to Commander, 1902 Mar 21
Official naval commission appointing William A. Marshall a Commander in the U.S. Navy from December 27, 1901, signed by President Theodore Roosevelt and SECNAV John D. Long on March 21, 1902.